U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00527-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Goudswaard
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Judgment]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 24, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 23, 2023: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 18, 2022: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Dismissal]
  • October 14, 2022: [Continue]
  • October 14, 2022: [Leave to File Dismissal per Rule 48(a)]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Order and Report on Person Under Supervision]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 08, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 13, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • April 08, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • April 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • April 07, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • April 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • April 07, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.