U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00109-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Valentine
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Amended Judgment]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • July 13, 2022: [Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • April 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.