U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00094-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Orona-Martinez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 21, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • September 19, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Reassign Case]
  • May 24, 2022: [Reassign Case]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • April 08, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.