U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00119-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Loch
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Reassign Case]
  • April 14, 2022: [Reassign Case]
  • April 13, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 11, 2022: [Detention]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • April 11, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.