U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00121-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Swinton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Memorandum Decision]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • November 09, 2022: [Memorandum Decision]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • November 08, 2022: [Memorandum Decision]
  • November 03, 2022: [In Limine]
  • November 02, 2022: [In Limine]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Bifurcate]
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Produce]
  • October 31, 2022: [Memorandum Decision]
  • October 31, 2022: [In Limine]
  • October 17, 2022: [Suppress]
  • October 06, 2022: [Bifurcate]
  • October 05, 2022: [Trial Order]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Produce]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 13, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 10, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • April 18, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • April 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 15, 2022: [Detention]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 12, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.