U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00038-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jeffs
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • August 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 07, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • April 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 19, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • April 18, 2022: [Detention]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.