U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00085-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cleaveland
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Dismissal]
  • January 17, 2023: [Leave to File Dismissal per Rule 48(a)]
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 09, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 20, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • April 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order]
  • April 12, 2022: [Discovery]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.