U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00041-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Montes-Hernandez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order]
  • April 26, 2022: [~Util - Interpreter Required]
  • April 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • April 14, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.