U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00040-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pena et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Order Vacating Hearing or Trial]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • October 04, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • September 22, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • September 22, 2022: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • September 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • August 02, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 10, 2022: [Continue]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 25, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • April 21, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • April 21, 2022: [~Util - Interpreter Required]
  • April 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 14, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.