U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00038-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gonzalez-Rosete et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • January 23, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 04, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 09, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 16, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • June 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 10, 2022: [Continue]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 09, 2022: [Brady Order]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 21, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • April 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 14, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.