U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00114-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McCormick
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 13, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 09, 2023: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 13, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel]
  • July 27, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • July 11, 2022: [Withdraw as Counsel]
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 07, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • April 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 27, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • April 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 25, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 14, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.