U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00041-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Piche-Hernandez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • August 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 12, 2022: [Strike]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 10, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • April 21, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 14, 2022: [Detention]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.