U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00088-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tauteoli
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Order and Report on Person Under Supervision]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 16, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 15, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 10, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Order Vacating Hearing or Trial]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 05, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • May 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 05, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 27, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 21, 2022: [Detention]
  • April 15, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 15, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • April 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • April 15, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.