U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cr-00085-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Oney
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 12, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 21, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 19, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 22, 2022: [Continue]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.