U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00099-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Malloy
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • May 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • May 02, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Detention]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.