U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00069-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lucero
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 15, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Order and Report on Person Under Supervision]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Order and Report on Person Under Supervision]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 27, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 02, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 19, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • April 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • April 19, 2022: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.