U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00129-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Townsend
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • April 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 19, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 19, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 18, 2022: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.