U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00145-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ocampo-Valentin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • April 29, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • April 29, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • April 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Fast Track Deadlines]
  • April 29, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 20, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.