U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00141-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Velle
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • November 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 10, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 28, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 20, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.