U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00053-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fain et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • March 21, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 21, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Opt Out of In-Person Hearing]
  • November 07, 2022: [Continue]
  • November 02, 2022: [Opt Out of In-Person Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 21, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order Vacating Hearing or Trial]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • May 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 18, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • May 18, 2022: [Substitute Attorney]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • May 06, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 21, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.