U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00042-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Torres-Rodriguez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • April 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 21, 2022: [~Util - Interpreter Required]
  • April 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Fast Track Deadlines]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.