U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00144-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gbaway
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 02, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • July 21, 2022: [Substitute Attorney]
  • July 05, 2022: [Withdraw as Counsel]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 14, 2022: [Continue]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 28, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • April 28, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • April 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 22, 2022: [Detention]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • April 21, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • April 21, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.