U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00031-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stephanie Nicole Summers
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 24, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 30, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 29, 2022: [Speedy Trial]
May, 2022
  • May 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order]
  • May 04, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • April 26, 2022: [Unseal Document]
  • April 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.