U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00157-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tanner
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • November 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • September 13, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Petition and Order]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 10, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 10, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 09, 2022: [Detention]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.