U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00153-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Runion
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • October 05, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Continue]
  • July 17, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 17, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • May 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 17, 2022: [Detention]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.