U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00043-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Heslop
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 10, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 07, 2023: [Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • November 29, 2022: [Furlough]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 01, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Continue]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 03, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel]
  • May 20, 2022: [Withdraw as Counsel]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • May 11, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 09, 2022: [Detention]
  • May 06, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.