U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00039-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mashburn
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • July 05, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 05, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • July 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 10, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • June 09, 2022: [Strike]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • May 09, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • May 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.