U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00163-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gutierrez-Farias
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • September 20, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • August 23, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • August 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 08, 2022: [Discovery]
  • June 03, 2022: [Detention]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • May 10, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • May 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Fast Track Deadlines]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.