U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00138-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gagnon
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • July 21, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 21, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • July 20, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order]
  • July 05, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 05, 2022: [Extension of Time]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 08, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 17, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • May 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 11, 2022: [Detention]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.