U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Smokoff
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • July 15, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 07, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 19, 2022: [Review of Detention]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • May 11, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order to Unseal Indictment]
  • May 10, 2022: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.