U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00167-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Williams
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 24, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 24, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 23, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 27, 2022: [Continue]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 17, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • May 16, 2022: [Detention]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 16, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.