U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00165-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Avalos-Garcia
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Opt Out of In-Person Hearing]
  • August 11, 2022: [Opt Out of In-Person Hearing]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
May, 2022
  • May 12, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • May 12, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • May 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Fast Track Deadlines]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.