U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00044-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Smith
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 10, 2022: [Continue]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 06, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Order]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • May 20, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 20, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • May 12, 2022: [Detention]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.