U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00156-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Vongkoth
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order and Report on Person Under Supervision]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 11, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 01, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 16, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 16, 2022: [Detention]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • May 13, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.