U.S. District Court for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-00335-2
  • Case Name: USA v. SEALED
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 12, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 15, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order to Unseal Magistrate Case]
  • May 12, 2022: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.