U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00050-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Trujillo-Mendez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • November 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 29, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 06, 2022: [Speedy Trial]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 16, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • May 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.