U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00051-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Guerra-Morales
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 18, 2022: [~Util - Interpreter Required]
  • May 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.