U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00053-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lansing
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2024
  • December 14, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 04, 2024: [Order on Motion for New Trial]
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 07, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 29, 2022: [Continue]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 22, 2022: [Continue]
  • August 12, 2022: [Discovery]
  • August 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Memorandum Decision]
  • July 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • May 20, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • May 20, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • May 19, 2022: [Discovery]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 19, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • May 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.