U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00034-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Keys et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 28, 2022: [Continue]
  • November 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial]
  • August 12, 2022: [Speedy Trial]
  • August 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 05, 2022: [Continue]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Consent Order Modifying Conditions of Release]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • July 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 12, 2022: [Brady Order]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 14, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Order Vacating Hearing or Trial]
  • May 20, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.