U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00005-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Madera
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • June 17, 2022: [Discovery]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 17, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • June 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 13, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 01, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 26, 2022: [Detention]
  • May 26, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 24, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.