U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00064-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fields
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Dismiss]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 23, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 22, 2022: [Continue]
  • December 14, 2022: [Petition and Order]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 12, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 11, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 29, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 28, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 25, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • May 25, 2022: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.