U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00153-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Riessen
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 14, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • June 01, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • June 01, 2022: [Brady Order]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Detention]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.