U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00171-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Monard
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 24, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 20, 2023: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 14, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 11, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 15, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • June 15, 2022: [Discovery]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 10, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 08, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 03, 2022: [Detention]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 27, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.