U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00189-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ford et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 13, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 12, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 22, 2022: [Discovery]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • June 22, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • June 22, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • June 14, 2022: [Unseal Case]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Detention]
  • May 31, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 26, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.