U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00060-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Arellano-Giles
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • December 18, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 02, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • June 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 02, 2022: [Brady Order]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Detention]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.