U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00191-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mausia et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 09, 2022: [Continue]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • November 02, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • November 02, 2022: [Discovery]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • November 02, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 28, 2022: [Continue]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • June 01, 2022: [Protective Order]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 26, 2022: [Brady Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.