U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00056-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Campos-Velasco et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • July 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • June 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • June 01, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • June 01, 2022: [~Util - Interpreter Required]
  • June 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • May 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 31, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • May 27, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 26, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.