U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00057-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rice
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Petition and Order]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 26, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 07, 2022: [Discovery]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • June 07, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 07, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 02, 2022: [Detention]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.