U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00287-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jones
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • December 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 05, 2022: [Review of Detention]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Reassign Case]
  • September 23, 2022: [Reassign Case]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • September 13, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • September 13, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • September 13, 2022: [Discovery]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Supervised Release]
  • June 01, 2022: [Early Termination of Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.