U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00197-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ivie
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • November 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 17, 2022: [Exclude]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Review of Detention]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • September 06, 2022: [Review of Detention]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 12, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • June 08, 2022: [Discovery]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • June 08, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • June 08, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 07, 2022: [Detention]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 02, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.